Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00644
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:39 AM PDT
Defendant
ABM Facility Seattle
Defendant
SEIU 6 Union
Plaintiff
Ronel Broussard
114 SW 332ND PL APT 2305
FEDERAL WAY, WA 98023


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 order 1 - Order Wed 04/23 10:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court cannot assess Plaintiffs application for IFP as written. Plaintiff must submit a revised, signed, and properly dated IFP application within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. He must provide complete and detailed financial information, including details on his monthly expenses and any further helpful information on why he cannot pay his filing fee. Failure to comply with this Order may result in denial of IFP or dismissal of the case. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TE)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 misc Letter Wed 04/16 12:22 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. Mailed to Plaintiff via USPS. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/16 12:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Ronel Broussard.(AVC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit