Terry Bush v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02079 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 7:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company LTD
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Securities Americas
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Plaintiff
Terry Bush
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 04/18 11:37 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/18/2025), Terry Bush v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02079-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District Court of Michigan (wmil, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12334416.), filed by Terry Bush. Service due by 6/16/2025(wmil, ) |