Original Case: 2:24-cv-10722

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01362
Typecivil / private / civil rights - title vii
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
SODECIA AUTOMOTIVE
Represented By
Kenneth W. Zatkoff
Dean & Fulkerson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MAKALE WASHINGTON
Represented By
Carla D. Aikens
Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 3:54 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB)
Related: [-]
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Carla D. Aikens; Makale Washington makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? no 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? no Certificate of Service: 04/16/2025. 25-1362 (CDA)
Related: [-]
CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Carla D. Aikens for Appellant Makale Washington. Is this case a cross-appeal? No; Has this case or a related one been before this court previously? No; Parties Against Whom this Appeal is Being Taken: Sodecia Automotive ; Issues: Whether it was improper to grant Defendant's Motion to Dismiss?. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2025. 25-1362 (CDA)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Makale Washington. Transcript needed: n. (RLB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Makale Washington by Carla D. Aikens. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2025. 25-1362 (CDA)
Related: [-]