Ronald Brown v. Office of the County Auditor
Original Case: 1:23-cv-10452
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:25-cv-01642 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:55 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
OFFICE OF THE COUNTY AUDITOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RONALD BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 3:40 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ronald Brown by 04/22/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 04/30/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/27/2025 for Ronald Brown. [1] [7447111] 25-1642 (JMB) [Entered: 04/16/2025 11:47 AM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |