District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Reggie B Walton
Case #: 1:25-cv-01165
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 9:05 AM EDT
Defendant
AARP INSURANCE PLAN
Represented By
Drew William Marrocco
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
AARP Inc.
Represented By
Drew William Marrocco
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
AARP SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Drew William Marrocco
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Genworth Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Drew William Marrocco
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York
Represented By
Drew William Marrocco
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A Kaplan
Plaintiff
Sharon R Kaplan


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs'18 Unopposed Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Gretchen Nelson, Nelson & Fraenkel, 601 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2050, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs'19 Unopposed Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Gabriel S. Barenfeld, Nelson & Fraenkel, 601 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2050, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 7:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gabriel S. Barenfeld, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11643151. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD A. KAPLAN, SHARON R. KAPLAN.(Llinas Negret, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 6:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gretchen M. Nelson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11643092. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD A. KAPLAN, SHARON R. KAPLAN.(Llinas Negret, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Duvall on behalf of AARP INC., AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP SERVICES, INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK (Duvall, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Tue 04/22 10:08 AM
Receipt on 4/21/2025 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2025-CAB-000322. (znmw)
Related: [-]
15 15 order .Order Mon 04/21 4:26 PM
GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 21, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Mon 04/21 8:53 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (zmtm) (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/21/2025) Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/21 8:50 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/21 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'8 Joint / Consent Motion to: (1) Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint and Set a Subsequent Briefing Schedule; and (2) Extend Plaintiffs' Time to Move for Class Certification, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) on or before May 15, 2025, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint; (2) on or before June 16, 2025, the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendants' motion to dismiss, if any; and (3) on or before July 10, 2025, the defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss, if any. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' deadline to file for class certification under Local Rule 23.1(b) is EXTENDED, and the plaintiffs shall file their motion for class certification within 90 days of the Court's resolution of the defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 21, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 12:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants'13 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Michael J. Duvall, Dentons US LLP, 601 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2500, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 21, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 7:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Duvall, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11628982. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AARP INC., AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP SERVICES, INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK.(Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Michael J. Duvall,
Att: 2 State Bar of California Certificate of Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Fri 04/18 10:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by AARP SERVICES, INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP INC. re1 Notice of Removal, filed by AARP SERVICES, INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP INC.. Related document:1 Notice of Removal, filed by AARP SERVICES, INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP INC., GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Fri 04/18 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Notice of Removal,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please locate the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Beckman Widay on behalf of AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP Inc., AARP SERVICES, INC., Genworth Life Insurance Company, Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York (Beckman Widay, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew William Marrocco on behalf of AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP Inc., AARP SERVICES, INC., Genworth Life Insurance Company, Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret on behalf of Richard A Kaplan, Sharon R Kaplan (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/17 11:11 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, re: (1) Extend defendants time to respond to the complaint and set subsequent briefing schedule; and (2) extend plaintiffs' time to move for class certification by AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP Inc., AARP SERVICES, INC., Genworth Life Insurance Company, Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York.(Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/17 10:16 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AARP INSURANCE PLAN (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/17 10:14 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AARP SERVICES, INC. (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/17 10:12 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AARP Inc. (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/17 10:10 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/17 10:08 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Genworth Life Insurance Company (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata Thu 04/17 9:46 AM
ERRATA re: Exhibit-A to Notice of Removal by Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York re1 Notice of Removal,. (Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/17 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2025-CAB-000322 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-11622354 filed by AARP SERVICES, INC., Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York, Genworth Life Insurance Company, AARP INSURANCE PLAN, AARP Inc..(Marrocco, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet