New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:25-cv-03179
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Edgar Bronfman, Jr.
Plaintiff
Untermotorisiert GmbH
Represented By
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/23 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/23/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Prose on behalf of Untermotorisiert GmbH..(Prose, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 9:10 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edgar Bronfman, Jr. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 04/18 9:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Erica Ashley Wolff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/18 9:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/18 9:07 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/18 9:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 10:51 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Untermotorisiert GmbH..(Wolff, Erica)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/17 10:49 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edgar Bronfman, Jr., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Untermotorisiert GmbH..(Wolff, Erica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 10:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolff, Erica)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Edgar Bronfman, Jr. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30945608)Document filed by Untermotorisiert GmbH..(Wolff, Erica)
Related: [-]