B.. v. Noem et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-03407 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 9:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Todd M. Lyons
|
|
Defendant
Krisit Noem
|
|
Plaintiff
W. B..
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() EXHIBITS re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byW. B... (Loveman, Ben) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byKrisit Noem, Todd M. Lyons.(Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 4:25-cv-03140-JSW. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/2025. (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
![]() AFFIDAVIT re notice to Defendants' Counsel by W. B... (Loveman, Ben) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/18 3:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for 4/22/2025, at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO ARRIVE IN COURTROOM 5, 17TH FLOOR NO LATER THAN 9:45 AM. TO CHECK-IN WITH THE COURTROOM DEPUTY. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 04/18 3:06 PM
ORDER. 8 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order shall be heard on Tuesday, 4/22/2025, at 10:00 a.m. Defendants shall file an opposition to the motion by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, 4/21/2025. Plaintiff shall immediately give Defendants notice of the hearing date and briefing schedule. Notice shall be given by email and by telephone. Plaintiff shall immediately file a declaration certifying that notice was given as ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/18 2:27 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 04/18 1:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by W. B...(Loveman, Ben) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Todd M. Lyons, Krisit Noem. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by W. B.... (Loveman, Ben) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION proceed under pseudonym filed by W. B... Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Responses due by 5/1/2025. Replies due by 5/8/2025. (Loveman, Ben) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/17 10:15 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. (Loveman, Ben) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20576886.). Injunction against the US government/official or APA vacatur requested. Filed by W. B...(Loveman, Ben) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |