Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-cv-00510
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Sutterfield
303 Thornwood Lane
Russellville, AR 72802
Defendant
Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
8585 Archives Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70809
Defendant
Wayne Smith Trucking, LLC
41 WST Circle
Morriltton, AR 72110
Plaintiff
Christi Cage
Plaintiff
Christopher Cage


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 04/24 3:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Sutterfield, Travelers Property Casualty, Wayne Smith Trucking Inc. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 12:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher Cage, Christi Cage. (aty,Moegle, Forrest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 9:02 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Cage, Christi Cage. (aty,Moegle, Forrest)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 9:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher Cage, Christi Cage. (aty,Moegle, Forrest)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Corrective Document Tue 04/22 2:34 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Complaint filed by Christopher Cage, Christi Cage . (aty,Moegle, Forrest)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 04/22 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Forrest Lee Moegle on behalf of Christopher Cage, Christi Cage. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/22 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Forrest Lee Moegle on behalf of Christopher Cage, Christi Cage regarding1 Complaint. Reason: Please resubmit on letter sized pdf. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael Sutterfield, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Co, Wayne Smith Trucking Inc (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6250779) filed by Christopher Cage, Christi Cage.(Attorney Forrest Lee Moegle added to party Christopher Cage(pty:pla), Attorney Forrest Lee Moegle added to party Christi Cage(pty:pla))(aty,Moegle, Forrest) Modified on 4/22/2025 to indicate deficient status and to remove jury demand from docket entry & court's docket since jury demand was not reflected in pleading filed. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Forrest Lee Moegle on behalf of Christopher Cage, Christi Cage regarding1 Complaint. Action taken: Modified to remove jury demand from docket entry & court's docket since jury demand was not reflected in pleading filed. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/24 3:50 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]