Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-13014

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David E Rice
Case #: 1:25-ap-00099
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Discover Bank
12 Read's Way
New Castle, DE 19720
Represented By
Discover Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer L Friedel
7626 Crescent Ave.
Baltimore, MD 21224
Represented By
David A. Castro
Stavisky, Yoffe & Castro, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/07 9:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-99 Closed. (Hutchinson, Janine)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/05 2:08 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Jennifer L Friedel. (Castro, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sun 04/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/17 9:00 AM
Summons Issued on Discover Bank Date Issued 4/17/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM. Virtual hearing - For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer L Friedel
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Wed 04/16 2:51 PM
Adversary case 25-00099 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by David A. Castro on behalf of Jennifer L Friedel against Discover Bank. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Castro, David)
Related: [-]