DOE #1 v. TRUMP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Madeline Cox Arleo |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02825 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:44 PM EDT |
Defendant
TODD M LYONS
|
|
Defendant
KRISTI NOEM
|
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
|
Defendant
JOHN TSOUKARIS
|
|
Plaintiff
STUDENT DOE #1
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE by All Defendants of new ICE policy(JUNEAU, ANGELA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 4/28/2025. Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 3:30 PM via Teleconference before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. (Court Reporter, Diane DiTizii (973-776-7738) (aa, ) |
|
31 | 31
![]() ORDER that a preliminary injunction imposing the same restraints as set forth in the Court's Order dated 4/18/2025, D.E.13 , will be continued until further order of the Court; scheduling a virtual status conference on 5/13/2025 at 3:30 PM before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/28/2025. (lag, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Mon 04/28 2:54 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEFF JOSEPH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (in-arm, ) |
||
Saturday, April 26, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Letter from Defendants regarding the status of Plaintiff's SEVIS records and issues remaining on the TRO re 28 Order,,. (JUNEAU, ANGELA) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Letter from Gregory Copeland & Jeff Joseph re 28 Order,,. (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Fri 04/25 7:40 PM
TEXT ORDER, In light of the change of policy announced today regarding termination of student visas, counsel shall each file a letter, no later than tomorrow, Saturday April 26 at 5 p.m., addressing the impact of this change, whether SEVIS and the Visa have been restored for this plaintiff, whether it is necessary to go forwards with the preliminary injunctive hearing on Monday, and if so, what issues need to be addressed. The parties are directed to meet and confer prior to filing letters. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/25/25. (aa, ) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order
Fri 04/25 6:52 PM
TEXT ORDER, the hearing scheduled for April 28, 2025 at 2 p.m. will be conducted via video conference. Invite will be sent via separate email. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/25/25. (aa, ) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order
Fri 04/25 2:03 PM
TEXT ORDER, the hearing scheduled for 4/28/25 at 1:00 p.m. is moved to 2:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/25/25. (aa, ) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Letter from Gregory P. Copeland re19 Order,. (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
24 | 24
![]() REPLY to Response re21 Response (NOT Motion).(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeff Joseph to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16197233.) (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER4 re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,.(JUNEAU, ANGELA) Modified on 4/23/2025 (mfr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
20 | 20
![]() Letter from Defendants confirming no witnesses will testify at Monday's TRO hearing re19 Order,. (JUNEAU, ANGELA) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Joseph. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/22/2025. (lag, ) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() LETTER ORDER that defendants' opposition is due 4/23/2025; that plaintiff's reply is due 4/25/2025; scheduling preliminary injunction hearing on 4/28/2025 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/21/2025. (lag, ) Modified on 4/21/2025 (pm, ) |
|
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE by STUDENT DOE #1 re 16 Order, Proposed Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing Dates(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
QC - Generic Message
Mon 04/21 2:05 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The previous docket text for the LETTER ORDER19 signed by Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo has been amended to correct an error. The defendant's opposition is due April 23, 2025. (pm, ) |
||
Sunday, April 20, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE by STUDENT DOE #1 re13 Order on Motion for TRO, Information for Defendants to Reinstate F-1 Student Status in SEVIS (COPELAND, GREGORY) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Saturday, April 19, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Sat 04/19 7:54 PM
TEXT ORDER, the Court is in receipt of counsel's request for an adjournment of the preliminary hearing date. Counsel is directed to meet and confer with government counsel regarding rescheduling of the hearing date and continuation of restraints and report to the Court no later than Monday, April 21, 2025 at 3 p.m. eastern time. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/19/2025. (aa, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() REDACTION to12 Order on Motion to Redact Document, Order on Motion to Seal Document Plaintiff's Redacted Declaration in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by STUDENT DOE #1. (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE by STUDENT DOE #1 re13 Order on Motion for TRO, OF CONFLICT WITH SCHEDULED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE DATE (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER granting4 Motion for TRO, setting briefing schedule: defendants response to motion is due on or before 4/25/25; plaintiff shall file their reply brief on or before 4/30/25; temporary restraints will remain until the Preliminary Injunction hearing on 5/6/25 at 2:00 p.m. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/18/25. (aa, ) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER granting10 Motion to Redact Document ; granting10 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/18/25. (aa, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Letter from Gregory Copeland & Jeff Joseph re 6 Order,.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Redact1 Complaint,4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Joseph ,3 MOTION re1 Complaint, to Proceed under Pseudonym , MOTION to Seal Document4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Plaintiff by STUDENT DOE #1.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA JUNEAU on behalf of All Defendants (JUNEAU, ANGELA) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STUDENT DOE #1 re 6 Order, (COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to TODD M LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, DONALD J. TRUMP, JOHN TSOUKARIS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 04/17 3:27 PM
TEXT ORDER, the Court is in receipt of plaintiff's motion, kindly confer with the government and advise by end of business day on 4/18/25 whether the parties can agree on a proposed expedited briefing schedule. Plaintiff is directed to forward this Order to the government and file a certificate of service once served. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/17/25. (aa, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for Summons to be Issued by STUDENT DOE #1 as to TODD M LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, DONALD J. TRUMP, JOHN TSOUKARIS.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by STUDENT DOE #1.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION re1 Complaint, to Proceed under Pseudonym by STUDENT DOE #1.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Joseph by STUDENT DOE #1.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against TODD M LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, DONALD J. TRUMP, JOHN TSOUKARIS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16182078), filed by STUDENT DOE #1.(COPELAND, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/17 2:26 PM
Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/17 4:10 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonym. Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/17 4:11 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mj) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/17 4:26 PM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeff Joseph . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, ) |