Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00161
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
CauseDiscrimination Based on Sex or Blindness - Education
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:05 PM EDT
Defendant
STEPHEN BOYD
119 SHERWOOD DRIVE
THOMASTON, GA 30286
Defendant
JUAN DIAZ
200 SOUTHLAND DRIVE APT H2
BARNESVILLE, GA 30204
Defendant
TIMOTHY JONES
1201 CHARDONNAY LANE
GRIFFIN, GA 30223
Defendant
Lamar County School District
100 VICTORY LAND
BARNESVILLE, GA 30204
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
218 WEST STATE STREET
SAVANNAH, GA 31401
Represented By
WILLIAM HUNTER
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANE DOE as to TIMOTHY JONES. (HUNTER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 04/24 5:03 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/24/2025. (saw)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANE DOE as to JUAN DIAZ. (HUNTER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 3:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANE DOE as to LAMAR COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (HUNTER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to TIMOTHY JONES. (rka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to STEPHEN BOYD, JUAN DIAZ, TIMOTHY JONES.(rka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Timothy Jones,
Att: 2 Summons Juan Diaz
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to LAMAR COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (rka)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Leave to File Thu 04/17 1:16 PM
FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Motion For Leave To Proceed Under Pseudonym by JANE DOE filed by WILLIAM HUNTER.(HUNTER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Thu 04/17 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4921501, $405 filed by JANE DOE(HUNTER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Lamar County School District,
Att: 3 Summons Summons Stephen Boyd,
Att: 4 Summons Summons Timothy Jones,
Att: 5 Summons Summons Juan Diaz