New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Therese Wiley Dancks
Case #: 1:25-cv-00474
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:06 PM EDT
Defendant
National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff
Justin Rocha
Represented By
Marc T. Wietzke
Flynn & Wietzke, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 04/23 4:58 PM
STATUS REPORT in Response to Notice of Admission requirement letter by Justin Rocha. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 4/23/2025 to correct docket text. (lmw)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 3:35 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary Allison Barnes Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-7108478. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Constable, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Marc Wietzke,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Mary A. Barnes,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 6 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (see)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party plaintiff; Attorneys C. Perrin Rome, III, W. Chad Stelly, M. Ali Barnes, Email addresses are prome@romearata.com, wcstelly@romearata.com, and abarnes@romearata.com. Phone number is (504) 522-9980. Admissions due by 5/1/2025. {Copies of admission requirements emailed to all three attorneys along with copies of GO25 on 4/17/2025}(see)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 04/17 2:08 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/14/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corp. (see)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7101827) filed by Justin Rocha.(see)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet