New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:25-cv-03200
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 motion Discovery Fri 04/25 1:06 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jacqueline M. James dated April 25, 2025. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 04/23 9:48 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/23 9:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/23 9:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/23 9:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 2:54 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
4 4 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30968142)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
Friday, April 18, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Fri 04/18 11:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/23/2025. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 04/17 1:19 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 1:16 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/17/2025 (kw)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 1:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 1:48 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (kw)
Related: [-]