New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:25-cv-03206
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
BCA Research
Defendant
Institutional Investor
Defendant
Kathy Knudsen
Plaintiff
Ambreen Bukhari
Represented By
Brendan C. Carman
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Vagnini on behalf of Ambreen Bukhari..(Vagnini, James)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/21 4:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 8/5/2025 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 646 453-4442, with Conference ID 675 278 33#. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against BCA Research, Institutional Investor, Kathy Knudsen. Document filed by Ambreen Bukhari..(Carman, Brendan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BCA Research, Institutional Investor, Kathy Knudsen..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 04/18 10:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan C. Carman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the ECF filing attorney of record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 04/18 10:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brendan C. Carman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:1983;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/18 10:40 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/18 10:42 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/18 10:42 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/17 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Institutional Investor, BCA Research, Kathy Knudsen, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ambreen Bukhari..(Carman, Brendan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 2:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carman, Brendan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 2:06 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against BCA Research, Institutional Investor, Kathy Knudsen. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30947365)Document filed by Ambreen Bukhari..(Carman, Brendan) Modified on 4/18/2025 (jgo)
Related: [-]