Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 4:25-cv-00775
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Masqood Ali
Defendant
Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina
Defendant
Rick Griggs
Defendant
John O'Grady
Plaintiff
Aieshya Kay Bellamy
Represented By
Abbi Novotny
contact info
Monique Hudson
Hudson Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 1:19 PM
Order On 4/17/2025, Plaintiff Aieshya Kay Bellamy filed this action against Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, Masqood Ali, John OGrady, and Rick Griggs. The file in this case shows no summons has been provided or issued. If Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendants by 5/19/2025, they shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendants should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/25/2025. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 04/24 3:41 PM
Order granting2 ,3 Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys Monique Hudson and Abbi Novotny for Plaintiff Aieshya Kay Bellamy. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/24/2025. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Thu 04/17 11:56 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 11:52 AM
Motion for attorney Abbi Novotny to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 6978, filed by Plaintiff Aieshya Kay Bellamy. Related document(s)1 .(D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 admission,
Att: 2 certificate of good standing
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 11:48 AM
Motion for attorney Monique Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 6977, filed by Plaintiff Aieshya Kay Bellamy. Related document(s)1 .(D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 admission,
Att: 2 certificate of good standing
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 11:32 AM
Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief with jury demand against Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, Masqood Ali, John O'Grady, Rick Griggs. Filing fee paid. $405.00. Receipt # 6976. Filed by Aieshya Kay Bellamy. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 civil cover sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 04/17 11:41 AM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 11:44 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 04/17 12:06 PM
Copy of1 Complaint with receipt,2 Motion to appear pro hac vice with receipt,3 Motion to appear pro hac vice with receipt4 Magistrate Consent Form Issued, mailed to Monique Hudson, Esq. at 3939 McKinney Avenue #155, Dallas, TX 75204 on 4/17/2025. Related document(s)4 ,2 ,1 ,3 . (D,Ju)
Related: [-]