Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:25-cv-00616
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 04/29 3:40 PM
Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (gd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 04/24 3:46 PM
Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Fri 04/18 11:32 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Adrienne Nelson to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/18/25.) (eo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 04/17 4:13 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Geoffrey E. Hammond, III. Filed by Geoffrey E. Hammond, III. (eo)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Thu 04/17 8:18 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/17/25.) (eo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Thu 04/17 8:18 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Geoffrey E. Hammond, III. (eo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 8:17 AM
Complaint. (IFP Submitted) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Geoffrey E. Hammond, III against All Defendants. (eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet