Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Katherine A Crytzer
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:25-cv-00159
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Yoli, LLC
Plaintiff
Sheri Brockington
5865 Ridgeway Center Parkway 5865 Ridgeway Center Parkway Suite 300
Memphis, TN 38120
Represented By
Brice M Timmons
Watson Burns, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Thu 05/15 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Benson Hathaway and Ryan Cadwallader: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (c/m to Benson Hathaway and Ryan Cadwallader) (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation Wed 05/14 6:53 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 12.1 by Sheri Brockington. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony I. Paronich on behalf of Sheri Brockington (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Tue 04/29 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheri Brockington. Yoli, LLC served on 4/28/2025. (Timmons, Brice)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 9:51 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 04/29/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043 on 4/29/2025 (MKM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 04/25 9:14 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony Paronich filed by Sheri Brockington (MKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 2:23 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony Paronich by Sheri Brockington. (Timmons, Brice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 10:40 AM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 04/23/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043 on 4/23/2025 (MKM)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Wed 04/23 9:03 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to William Burns regarding document: 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William F. Burns, Esq. filed by Sheri Brockington (MKM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:57 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William F. Burns, Esq. by Sheri Brockington. (Timmons, Brice)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Yoli, LLC. (MKM)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 04/17 4:04 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/17/2025. c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043. (MKM)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 04/17 4:03 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/17/2025. c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043. (MKM)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 04/17 4:03 PM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/17/2025. c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043. (MKM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Thu 04/17 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Anthony Paronich. c/m Anthony I. Paronich, Paronich Law, P.C., 350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400, Hingham, MA 02043. (MKM)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Yoli, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5968651.), filed by Sheri Brockington.(Timmons, Brice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued to Yoli, LLC,
Att: 2 Other Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/17 2:59 PM
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (MKM)
Related: [-]