South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-03257
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
475 Anton Blvd
Casta Mesa, CA 92626
Plaintiff
Jon Windham
Represented By
Penny Hays Cauley
Hays Cauley PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Jon Windham. Experian Information Solutions Inc waiver executed on 4/24/2025, answer due 6/23/2025. (Cauley, Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. (swel, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/17 1:21 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jon Windham.(swel, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions Inc ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12396093), filed by Jon Windham. Service due by 7/16/2025(swel, )
Related: [-]