California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:25-cv-03415
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 12:10 PM PDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Director Kika Scott
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, Danielle Lehman, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 04/22 4:03 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 04/22 8:30 AM
Case assigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/22 7:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Harry Girard Lewis on behalf of Gulcan Yavuz (Lewis, Harry)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Mon 04/21 1:39 PM
Proposed Summons. (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 12:05 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Gulcan Yavuz . (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 10:35 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20588098.) filed by Gulcan Yavuz. (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 04/18 11:02 AM
Proposed Summons. (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 10:50 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Gulcan Yavuz . (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 10:43 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Gulcan Yavuz .(Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20582816.). Filed by Gulcan Yavuz. (Serbest, Metin)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 04/18 1:00 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (12/2024) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gulcan Yavuz,3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gulcan Yavuz (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 04/18 4:33 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached.Please re-file in its entirety. Please refile as a Single Summons with all Defendants listed. You can use an attachment page to list Defendants. Re:4 Proposed Summons filed by Gulcan Yavuz (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]