California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-03390
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25STCP01008
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 12:10 PM PDT
Defendant
AXA XL INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAS
Represented By
Michael W. Melendez
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Defendant
Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael W. Melendez
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF MARIAM SAHEGHIAN
Plaintiff
JOHN SAHEGHIAN
Plaintiff
MARIAM SAHEGHIAN
Plaintiff
MICHAEL SAHEGHIAN
Plaintiff
MIKE SAHEGHIAN


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 05/16 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Anne Hwang. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anne Hwang. (ys)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 05/15 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order was not submitted as a separate, additional attachment to each motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
16 16 motion Transfer Case Wed 05/14 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware and referral to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware filed by Defendants AXA XL Insurance Company Americas, Greenwich Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anne Hwang. (Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Counterclaim Wed 05/14 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition10 , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Greenwich Insurance Company.(Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
14 14 motion Dismiss Case Wed 05/14 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant AXA XL Insurance Company Americas. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anne Hwang. (Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 05/07 3:48 PM
Corrected STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Greenwich Insurance Company answer now due 5/14/2025; AXA XL Insurance Company Americas answer now due 5/14/2025, re Amended Complaint/Petition10 filed by Defendants Greenwich Insurance Company; AXA XL Insurance Company Americas.(Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 05/06 4:07 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Anne Hwang.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and differs in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 05/05 4:27 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03390-AH (JPRx). (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 04/30 5:45 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Mike Saheghian(Nevell, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 04/24 11:47 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Greenwich Insurance Company answer now due 5/13/2025; AXA XL Insurance Company Americas answer now due 5/13/2025, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Greenwich Insurance Company; AXA XL Insurance Company Americas.(Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 trial Jury Demand Mon 04/21 6:00 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Mike Saheghian.. (Nevell, Todd)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/21 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Nevell, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/21 3:46 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/21 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/21 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (mza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/17 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AXA XL INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAS, Greenwich Insurance Company, identifying XL Specialty Insurance Company; X.L. America, Inc.; XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited; XL Bermuda Ltd; XL Group Ltd; AXA SA.(Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to Certification and Notice of Interested Parties
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 11:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AXA XL INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAS, Greenwich Insurance Company. (Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 25STCP01008 Receipt No: ACACDC-39526071 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Greenwich Insurance Company, AXA XL INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attorney Michael W. Melendez added to party AXA XL INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAS(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W. Melendez added to party Greenwich Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Melendez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proofs of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AXA XL Insurance Company Americas, Does, Greenwich Insurance Company. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiffs John Saheghian, Michael Saheghian, Mariam Saheghian, Mike Saheghian, Estate of Mariam Saheghian. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/14/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Saheghian, Michael Saheghian, Mariam Saheghian, Mike Saheghian, Estate of Mariam Saheghian, upon Defendant AXA XL Insurance Company Americas served on 3/20/2025; Greenwich Insurance Company served on 3/20/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/20/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]