S. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-03417 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
1515 3rd St
San Francisco, CA 94158 |
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158 |
|
Plaintiff
L. S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by L. S.. All Defendants. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/17 1:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by L. S. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20578444.). Filed by L. S..(Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 04/18 9:38 AM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084. Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-03417-CRB L.S. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., et al; cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Fri 04/18 9:47 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:23-md-03084-CRB. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |