New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:25-cv-02155
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Jared W. Cordero
Defendant
John Does 1 - 5
Defendant
Daniel Lacalamita
Defendant
Michael R. Moran
Defendant
Alvin M. Nieves
Defendant
The City of New York
Defendant
Stanislav Zubyk
Plaintiff
Keyanna Moody
Represented By
Eric Sanders
The Sanders Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 7:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. The City of New York served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
12 12 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/26 5:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. Daniel Lacalamita served on 4/23/2025, answer due 5/14/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/26 5:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. Stanislav Zubyk served on 4/23/2025, answer due 5/14/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/26 5:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. Michael R. Moran served on 4/23/2025, answer due 5/14/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/26 5:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. Alvin M. Nieves served on 4/23/2025, answer due 5/14/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 04/26 5:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyanna Moody. Jared W. Cordero served on 4/23/2025, answer due 5/14/2025. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 3 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Jared W. Cordero, Daniel Lacalamita, Michael R. Moran, Alvin M. Nieves, The City of New York, Stanislav Zubyk. (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 10:19 AM
Proposed Summons. by Keyanna Moody (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/18 10:11 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 04/18 9:49 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/18 9:36 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Please remove John/Jane Doe from Rider and resubmit a new Proposed Summons to Named Parties Only, Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 3:46 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Keyanna Moody (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 3:46 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Filing Fee Received,1 Complaint, by Keyanna Moody (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Jared W. Cordero, John Does 1 - 5, Daniel Lacalamita, Michael R. Moran, Alvin M. Nieves, The City of New York, Stanislav Zubyk Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Keyanna Moody. (Sanders, Eric)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 04/17 3:42 PM
FILING FEE: $ 405.00, receipt number ANYEDC-18964242 (SDM)
Related: [-]