Bing v. SSA
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory F Vantatenhove |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00017 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs [R.2 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 4/22/2025. (JJ) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Clifford Farrell by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2.(CBD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() GENERAL ORDER 22-15: STANDING PROCEDURES GOVERNING FILINGS, BRIEFING, AND RESOLUTION OF ACTIONS: 1. An action is commenced upon filing of the complaint. 2. Clerk to notify Commissioner of Social Security and the U.S. Attorney via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). 3. Answer to the complaint must be served within 60 days of notice of the action as outlined in (2) above. 4. FRCP 12 motions due within 60 days of notice of action as outlined in (2) above. 5. Action is presented for decision by parties briefs. (a) Plaintiffs Brief is due 30 days after the answer is filed OR within 30 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under paragraph (4) above. (b) Commissioners Brief due within 30 days after service of Plaintiffs Brief. (c) Plaintiff's Reply brief due within 14 days after service of Commissioners Brief. 6. Extensions of time, page limitations or permissions to file additional briefs may be granted for good cause shown. 7. Except as otherwise provided motion practice shall be governed by LR 7.1. 8. Clerk directed to file this General Order in all actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). 9. On December 1, 2022, this General Order shall supersede General Order 13-17. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. CC: COR.(CBD) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aim E. Bing (CBD) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT (No Process Necessary), filed by Aim E. Bing.(CBD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Conflict Check
Thu 04/17 4:20 PM
Conflict Check run. (CBD) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 04/17 4:29 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aim E. Bing (CBD) |