Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:25-cv-05326
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:Skamania County Superior Court, 25-00002-00029-30
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
County of Clark
Represented By
Paul J Lawrence
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Belkot
Represented By
Richard M Stephens
Stephens & Klinge LLP
contact info
Respondent
Wil Fuentes
Represented By
Paul J Lawrence
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 04/24 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Clark County, Wil Fuentes.(Lawrence, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard M Stephens on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Belkot. (Stephens, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Fri 04/18 11:47 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/3/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/10/2025, Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 04/18 11:04 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Skamania County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 04/18 10:59 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/18 10:44 AM
District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 04/18 2:35 PM
Attorney Charles A Klinge added for Michelle Belkot; per5 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/17 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Skamania County Superior, case number 25 2-00029 30; Related [+] filed by County of Clark, Wil Fuentes.(Lawrence, Paul)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8934530
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Other State Court Filings,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet