California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:25-cv-03414
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court, County of Contra Costa, MS25-0288
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Nathan Parsons
4220 Clayton Road, Bldg 2 Unit #212
Concord, CA 94521
Plaintiff
Clayton Gardens
Represented By
Kiyoshi Din
Kimball Tirey & St. John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/22 1:10 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be remanded to the Superior Court. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 22, 2025. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 4/22/2025 Modified on 4/22/2025 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 10:33 AM
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Issuance of summons and service will be determined separately. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 4/22/2025 Modified on 4/22/2025 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/17 2:35 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/17 2:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nathan Parsons. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/17 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is MS25-0288. (In forma pauperis pending) Filed by Nathan Parsons. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2025.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet