Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Nancy J Rosenstengel
Case #: 3:25-cv-00662
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 12:58 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 04/28 2:37 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Carl Walker. (kare)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 04/18 9:25 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc.2 ) but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period of October 17, 2024, thru April 17, 2025, no later than 45 days from the date of this order (June 2, 2025). Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Vienna Correctional Center. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/18/2025. (mado)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 order Order Thu 04/17 3:46 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 25-662-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/17/2025. (kare)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Requesting Consent Thu 04/17 3:15 PM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 386, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 4/17/2025. Consent due by 5/8/2025 (kare)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Recruitment of Counsel Thu 04/17 3:14 PM
MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Carl Walker. (kare)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/17 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Walker. (kare)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carl Walker.(kare)
Related: [-]