California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00801
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02025-01464167
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:06 PM PDT
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff
Paul Dickinson
5502 Karen Ave.
Cypress, CA 90630


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 04/24 4:16 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for 6/26/2025 at 9:00 a.m. **Counsel shall review full Order for details.** (rrp)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Thu 04/24 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The pro se litigant's email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigant's email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 53. (jtil)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/22 9:13 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/21 10:01 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/21 10:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/21 10:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 04/17 4:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on April 17, 2025. (Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 3:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. identifying HSBC Holdings, plc as Corporate Parent. (Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/17 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A., identifying HSBC USA, Inc.; HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.; HSBC Holdings PLC; Paul Dickinson. (Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 3:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2025 01464167-CU-MC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-39528958 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attorney Samuel Augustine Moniz added to party HSBC Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft))(Moniz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer S. Garrett,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Materials HSBC received on March 19, 2025,
Att: 3 Declaration of Samuel A. Moniz,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Order Scheduling Case Management Conference,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Hearing,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Summons,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Register of Actions in the State Court Action
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/21 9:31 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Paul Dickinson in Orange County Superior Court on 3/3/2025, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
Related: [-]