California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-03406
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Clybourn Industrial Partners, LLC
Defendant
Plastic Depot
Plaintiff
Moises Villalobos
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/30 9:42 AM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/25 11:44 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 04/20 10:33 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Clybourn Industrial Partners, LLC, Plastic Depot. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/20 10:29 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/20 10:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/20 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 04/17 2:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/17 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39528727 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Moises Villalobos(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]