California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:25-cv-03409
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25CMCV00428
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:08 PM PDT
Defendant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP 695 Town Center Drive Suite 400
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Represented By
Karen Liao
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Enrique Lopez
The Injury Law Firm 3500 West Olive, Suite 300
Burbank, CA 91505


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/01 9:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 notice Settlement Wed 04/30 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Case filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/25 11:48 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/21 4:27 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/21 4:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/21 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (mza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 04/17 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice (Other)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 served on April 17, 2025. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/17 2:58 PM
Notice NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT [28 U.S.C. 1441(b)] filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/17 2:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., identifying Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25CMCV00428 Receipt No: ACACDC-39529070 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attorney Karen Liao added to party HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.(pty:dft))(Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/21 4:19 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Enrique Lopez. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/13/25. SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/21 4:23 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. [FILED IN STATE COURT 4/16/25. SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](mza)
Related: [-]