California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-03411
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Nova Market & Catering, Inc.
Defendant
V.M.A Properties, LLC
Plaintiff
Ignacio Vera
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
15 15 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 05/16 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:Text Only Entry. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case is returned for random reassignment to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03411-MEMF-MARx.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
14 14 9 pgs order Order Thu 05/15 4:08 PM
DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Veras state law claims. The Court therefore DISMISSES the Unruh Act claim, California Disabled Persons Act claim, the California Health and Safety Code, and the negligence claim WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/13 12:05 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibility of the parties to maintain familiarity with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
12 12 misc Response Mon 05/12 9:45 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Verato Order to Show Cause,,,9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, May 09, 2025
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 05/09 4:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant V.M.A Properties, LLC served on 5/4/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon VIKEN KRADJIAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 05/09 4:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Nova Market & Catering, Inc. served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/29 12:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'SSTATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. In light of the foregoing, the Court orders Vera to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, the California Disabled Persons Act claim, the California Health and Safety Code claim, and the negligence claim. Vera shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than fourteen days from the date of this order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may,without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, the California Disabled Persons Act claim, the California Health and Safety Code claim, and the negligence claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 2:08 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Nova Market & Catering, Inc. and V.M.A Properties, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/21 9:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/21 9:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/21 9:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 04/17 2:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/17 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 2:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39529331 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Ignacio Vera(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]