Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:25-cv-03230 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, April 27, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Discovery. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/25/25) (yv) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() LETTER MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas dated April 25, 2025. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30949583)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |