California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:25-bk-30299
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 19, 2025
Claims Deadline:Aug 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
3005 Wiljan Court, LLC
PO Box 2241
San Anselmo, CA 94979-2241
Represented By
Brent D. Meyer
Meyer Law Group, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - SF
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 04/30 12:07 PM
Substitution of Attorney . Attorney Jay K Chien terminated. Paul G. Leahy added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustees Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF, Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF (Leahy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes Wed 04/23 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes
Sunday, April 20, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/20 9:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/20 9:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Generate 341 Notices
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 order Payment of Taxes Fri 04/18 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Status Conference Chp 11 Fri 04/18 4:08 PM
Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 6/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Status Conference Statement due by 6/10/2025 (vmv)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Generate 341 Notices Fri 04/18 10:14 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (vmv)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/18 9:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jay K Chien. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF (Chien, Jay)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of Obsolete Forms Fri 04/18 9:06 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Regarding Obsolete Forms and Dismissal of Case in Event of Failure to Cure Official Forms due by 5/2/2025. (vmv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Thu 04/17 3:36 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/19/2025 at 01:00 PM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 8/18/2025. (Meyer, Brent)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 04/17 3:26 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 30000.00 Filed by Debtor 3005 Wiljan Court, LLC (Meyer, Brent)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/17 3:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by 3005 Wiljan Court, LLC. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 05/19/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 04/24/2025. (Meyer, Brent)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 04/17 3:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-30299 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33810097, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)