Colorado District Court
Judge:Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:25-cv-01221
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2672mv - Federal Tort Claims Act -- Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:07 PM MDT
Defendant
USA
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Plaintiff
Seth Berry
425 Hass Court
Dacono, CO 80514
Represented By
Scott D. Goldman
Goldman Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed as to USA - Complaint Tue 05/13 10:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United States of America defendant(s) Seth Berry served on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/30/2025.(Goldman, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service USPS Executed by Fred Lowe USPS,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Executed by Paul Koch USPS
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 misc Summons Issued Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark A. Haydel, Jr on behalf of Seth BerryAttorney Mark A. Haydel, Jr added to party Seth Berry(pty:pla) (Haydel, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 10:57 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 22 April 2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/31/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
7 7 order Minute Order Tue 04/22 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is July 24, 2025. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 4/22/2025. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Mon 04/21 10:30 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Attorney Mark A. Haydel, attempted to enter his appearance on behalf of Plaintiff in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to ECF Docket Entry No. 1. Counsel was administratively removed from the attorney roll for failing to pay a past biennial fee. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), counsel's purported appearance cannot be recognized. Counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance upon obtaining reinstatement to the Court's bar should he wish to participate further in any proceedings in this case. (Text Only Entry) (zcoth) (zcoth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 misc Summons Request Thu 04/17 4:17 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by Plaintiff Seth Berry. (Goldman, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 04/17 3:33 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. A summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file corrected summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (echa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 04/17 3:31 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 04/17 3:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Post Office (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10285162)Attorney Scott D. Goldman added to party Seth Berry(pty:pla), filed by Seth Berry.(Goldman, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons for United States of America,
Att: 2 Summons Summons for United States Postal Service