Nevada District Court
Judge:Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:25-cv-00195
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order Concerning Review of Social Security Cases Mon 04/21 1:17 PM
ORDER CONCERNING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Option to Decline MJ - FORM Mon 04/21 8:00 AM
OPTION TO DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE OVERSEEING YOUR CASE. The attached form must be filed in the docket or received by the Clerk within 21 days of your first appearance in the case should you choose to decline consent. (A copy of the form has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc General Orders regarding MJ assignment Mon 04/21 7:59 AM
GENERAL ORDER 2023-12 IN RE: DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 636. (A copy of the General Order has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 04/21 7:57 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 04/18 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Phillip Vechil. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-8024805) by David Phillip Vechil. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/28/2025. Proof of service due by 7/17/2025. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet