Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:25-bk-02455
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC
3330 Henderson Blvd Ste 203
Tampa, FL 33609-2954
Represented By
Kevin Comer
Comer Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/29 4:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Seth P. Traub on behalf of Tamara Nasser, Nasr Alghrairi. (Traub, Seth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Mon 04/28 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/26 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
11 11 3 pgs order Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf Fri 04/25 7:51 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2025 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Dana B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Wed 04/23 12:28 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/14/2025 at 04:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/26/2025. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 04/22 5:03 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Kathleen L DiSanto added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for May 14, 2025, at 4:00 p.m. telephonically via US Trustee - Tampa/Ft. Myers. Filed by Nicole Peair on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Peair, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 04/21 7:05 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of Debtor LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 04/21 7:05 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of Debtor LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/21 7:04 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of Debtor LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Mon 04/21 4:02 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of Debtor LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Mon 04/21 4:00 PM
Schedules A - J and Summary of Assets, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of Debtor LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Mon 04/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Fri 04/18 11:45 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. List of Creditors, Summary of Schedules, Schedules A/B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure, List of 20 Largest, List of Equity Security Holders, Certificate or Resolution Authorizing Filing, Chp 11 Case Management Summary and Statement of Corporate Ownership Related [+]. (Perkins, Cathy)Modified on 4/18/2025 (CEP)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/17 8:41 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Kevin Comer on behalf of LAZZARA FAMILY BRICK PAVERS, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/16/2025. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Thu 04/17 8:43 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:25-bk-02455] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79306377, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Thu 04/17 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]