North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:25-bk-01396
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 13, 2025
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 14, 2025

Debtor
Carolina EB-5 Regional Center L.L.C.
217 China Grove Ct
Holly Springs, NC 27540-4803
Represented By
William H. Kroll
Everett Gaskins Hancock, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John C Bircher, III
John C. Bircher III, Trustee 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560


Docket last updated: 04/18/2025 12:16 AM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 04/17 12:15 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-01396 5] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00), Receipt Number A18479781, Amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditor Add Upload Thu 04/17 12:20 PM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 13 creditor(s). (adi)
Related: [-]
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload Thu 04/17 12:12 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition filed by William H. Kroll of Everett Gaskins Hancock, LLP on behalf of Carolina EB-5 Regional Center L.L.C.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Request re: Debtor Electronic Notice Thu 04/17 12:32 PM
Request to Decline Debtor Electronic Notice filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Carolina EB-5 Regional Center L.L.C.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 04/17 12:35 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement - / Fee Not Required filed by William H. Kroll on behalf of Carolina EB-5 Regional Center L.L.C.. (Kroll, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset - Auto Assign) Thu 04/17 6:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors With 341(a) Meeting To Be Held On 5/13/2025 At 09:30 AM At Zoom 341 Meeting Raleigh. Last day to file complaint is 7/14/2025. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]