District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-01040
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
JD VANCE
Defendant
PAMELA J. BONDI
Plaintiff
JANE A. DEREWAL
1313 New York Avenue, NW #BSMT
Washington, DC 20005


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/19 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing by JANE A. DEREWAL re5 Response to Order of the Court (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/19 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing by JANE A. DEREWAL re5 Response to Order of the Court (znmw)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form Mon 05/19 5:14 PM
UPDATED Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by JANE A. DEREWAL (znmw)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/19 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by JANE A. DEREWAL (znmw)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/19 5:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JANE A. DEREWAL. (znmw)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Errata Mon 05/19 5:11 PM
ERRATA by JANE A. DEREWAL re6 Complaint.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Notice and Consent
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/19 5:10 PM
NOTICE to Correct Case Caption by JANE A. DEREWAL re Minute Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 cmp Complaint Mon 05/19 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against PAMELA J. BONDI, JD VANCE with Jury Demand filed by JANE A. DEREWAL.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion (Not required)
5 5 respm Response to Order of the Court Mon 05/19 5:07 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Minute Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE A. DEREWAL. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Thu 04/17 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it does not address the five-factor inquiry that applies to such motions, see In re Sealed Case , 971 F.3d 324, 326-27 (D.C. Cir. 2020); 2) Within fourteen days of the Court's Order, Plaintiff shall file either a new Motion that addresses the factors identified in In re Sealed Case or a Notice advising the Clerk of the Court whether she wishes to proceed under her true name, and, if so, she shall also file her 3 Motion on the public docket as an appendix to that Notice; and 3) If Plaintiff does not file a new Motion or such Notice within fourteen days, the Clerk is directed to terminate the case. The factors identified in In re Sealed Case are: 1) whether the justification asserted by the requesting party is merely to avoid the annoyance and criticism that may attend any litigation or is to preserve privacy in a matter of a sensitive and highly personal nature; 2) whether identification poses a risk of retaliatory physical or mental harm to the requesting party or, even more critically, to innocent non-parties; 3) the ages of the persons whose privacy interests are sought to be protected; 4) whether the action is against a governmental or private party; and, relatedly, 5) the risk of unfairness to the opposing party from allowing an action against it to proceed anonymously. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/17/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Thu 04/17 12:15 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmgb)
Related: [-]