District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:25-cv-01183
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:08 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
ERIC GAUDIOSI
Defendant
SHANE MYERS
Defendant
MARCO RUBIO
Plaintiff
JAGMOHAN SINGH
Represented By
Sadaf F. Ahmed
Jeelani Law Firm, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 trial Exhibit List Mon 04/21 4:19 PM
Exhibit List Exhibit A by JAGMOHAN SINGH. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 order .Order Fri 04/18 2:19 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/18/2025. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Fri 04/18 2:13 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to STRIKE Exhibit A to the Complaint from the docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/18/2025. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Strike Fri 04/18 11:35 AM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, Exhibit A or seal Exhibit A by JAGMOHAN SINGH.(Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit REDACTED EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 04/18 9:57 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ERIC GAUDIOSI, SHANE MYERS, MARCO RUBIO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/18 9:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 7:50 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, ERIC GAUDIOSI, SHANE MYERS, MARCO RUBIO ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11625612) filed by JAGMOHAN SINGH.(Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY,
Att: 3 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL,
Att: 4 Summons SUMMONS FOR MARCO RUBIO,
Att: 5 Summons SUMMONS FOR SHANE MYERS,
Att: 6 Summons SUMMONS FOR ERIC GAUDIOSI,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET