Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:25-cv-01253
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause11:101 Bankruptcy (Definitions)
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025

Debtor
Burtonsville Crossing, LLC

,
Debtor
ElderHome Land, LLC

,
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Appellant
Elizabeth Norris
P.O. Box 310
Ashton, MD 20861
Appellant
Thomas Norris
P.O. Box 310
Ashton, MD 20861
Appellee
Marc Carmel
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Zvi Guttman
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Craig B. Leavers
P.O. Box 306
Cockeysville, MD 21030
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Millenium Investment Group, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Alan J. Perlman
Fowler, White, Burnett, Hurley Banick & Strickroot 100 Southeast Second Street 17 Floor
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
SC210034, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Appellee
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Represented By
Lisa Yonka Stevens
Doj-Ust
contact info
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis
Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC
contact info
Zvi Guttman
The Law Offices Of Zvi Guttman, P.A.
contact info
Craig Burton Leavers
The Law Offices Of Craig B. Leavers
contact info
Indexed Party
Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland
Trustee
United States Trustee


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 2:48 PM
ORDER directing that within 10 days of the date of this Order: Appellants must submit the designation and statement to the Court and must serve the designation and statement on Appellee; Appellants must submit a statement explaining their delay in filing and serving those documents. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/6/2025. (c/m as 5/6/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 appeal Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Fri 05/02 11:32 AM
Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record, no designation of record filed re1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BK Docket Sheet
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 04/17 3:47 PM
Correspondence from Clerk re: Briefs (c/m p 4/17/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Thu 04/17 3:43 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 21-10492 , filed by Elizabeth Norris, Thomas Norris. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Denying Motion for Stay Pending Appeal,
Att: 2 Order Approving Auction Bidder and Directing Execution of Closing Instruments,
Att: 3 BK Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Transmittal Sheet