Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:25-cv-00425
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:08 AM EDT
defendant
James N. Fox
defendant
Thomas Stipp
defendant
Warren Sibilla
defendant
Rebecca Shelter-Fast
defendant
Heather Schuetz
defendant
Mary Raatz
defendant
Hannah Musgraves
defendant
Sumaita Hassan
defendant
Brent Fifer, Jr.
defendant
Lisa Brown
defendant
Lashell Brown
defendant
David C. Bonfiglio
defendant
Eric Blackman
defendant
Christopher Anderson
defendant
Joel Williams
plaintiff
Ashley Eilene Franklin
95255 Wildwood Drive
Dowagiac, MI 49047


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/14 2:58 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Lashell Brown served on 5/12/2025, answer due 6/2/2025; Mary Raatz served on 5/12/2025, answer due 6/2/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 05/13 9:56 AM
ORDER denying8 motion for reconsideration; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 05/13 10:12 AM
Copy of Order on Motion for Reconsideration13 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed by USM (by personal service) Wed 05/07 3:11 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Christopher Anderson served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Eric Blackman served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; David C. Bonfiglio served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Lisa Brown served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Brent Fifer, Jr served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; James N. Fox served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Sumaita Hassan served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Hannah Musgraves served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Heather Schuetz served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Rebecca Shelter-Fast served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025; Warren Sibilla served on 5/6/2025, answer due 5/27/2025; Thomas Stipp served on 5/6/2025, answer due 5/27/2025; Joel Williams served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025 (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Fri 05/02 9:17 AM
Copy of Order on Motion for TRO11 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashley Eilene Franklin (ems)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Thu 05/01 3:43 PM
ORDER denying10 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 04/29 3:37 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order with certificate of service by plaintiff Ashley Eilene Franklin; (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A-1C,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2A-2C,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3A-3B,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4A,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5A-5D,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6A-6B,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7A,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8A-8B,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9A-9B,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10A-10B,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11A-11C,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12A,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13A-13C,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14A,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15A,
Att: 17 Proposed Order temporary restraining order,
Att: 18 Proposed Order preliminary injunction
9 9 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (mg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Reconsideration Tue 04/29 2:56 PM
MOTION for reconsideration re7 by plaintiff Ashley Eilene Franklin; (mg)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued and Delivered to Marshal Tue 04/29 3:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Anderson, Eric Blackman, David C. Bonfiglio, Lashell Brown, Lisa Brown, Brent Fifer, Jr, James N. Fox, Sumaita Hassan, Hannah Musgraves, Mary Raatz, Heather Schuetz, Rebecca Shelter-Fast, Warren Sibilla, Thomas Stipp, Joel Williams and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service Wed 04/23 10:43 AM
ORDER denying3 pro se application for electronic filing and service; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 04/23 2:53 PM
Copy of Order on Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service7 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge6 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 12:56 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Remark - public Mon 04/21 3:23 PM
Remark: Copy of docket sheet and 15 blank summonses mailed to plaintiff. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/17 1:59 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Receipt of Case Notice Thu 04/17 11:16 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/17 11:18 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice4 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/17 2:38 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis5 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service Thu 04/17 11:15 AM
PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Thu 04/17 11:14 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Ashley Eilene Franklin (mg)
Related: [-]