Choi v. Corewell Health
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00434 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:08 AM EDT |
defendant
COREWELL HEALTH f/k/a SPECTRUM HEALTH
|
|
plaintiff
Bruce Choi
carla d. Aikens plc 615 griswold st suite 709
detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bruce Choi as to All Plaintiffs (Aikens, Carla) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
service
Summons Not Issued
Wed 04/30 10:45 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Corewell Health (not provided to the court) (slk) |
||
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corewell Health filed by Bruce Choi (Aikens, Carla) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (slk) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Fri 04/18 3:00 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Corewell Health (not provided to the court) (slk) |
||
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with jury demand against COREWELL HEALTH f/k/a SPECTRUM HEALTH filed by Bruce Choi (Aikens, Carla) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Thu 04/17 11:47 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Bruce Choi in the amount of $405, receipt number BMIWDC-7673892 (Aikens, Carla) |