California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:25-bk-10654
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 14, 2025

Debtor
Apollo Import Export, Inc.
13340 Saticoy St Ste O
North Hollywood, CA 91605-7644
Represented By
Allen A Sarkisian
Law Offices Of Allen A. Sarkisian, A.P.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nancy J Zamora (TR)
U.S. Bank Tower 633 West 5th Street, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/18/2025 12:03 AM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/17 6:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:25-bk-10654] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58304713. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/17 5:59 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Apollo Import Export, Inc. (Sarkisian, Allen)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/17 7:13 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Zamora (TR), Nancy J with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/14/2025 at 02:30 PM via Zoom - Zamora: Meeting ID 885 749 7200, Passcode 8554842533, Phone 1 747 281 2462. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]