California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:25-bk-10991
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 23, 2025

Debtor
SourceOne Ventures, Inc.
1241 N Lakeview Ave Ste M
Anaheim, CA 92807-1832
Represented By
Halli B Heston
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
26400 La Alameda, Suite 210
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/18/2025 12:04 AM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/17 5:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-10991] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58304582. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/17 5:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by SourceOne Ventures, Inc. (Heston, Halli)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 04/17 5:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor SourceOne Ventures, Inc.. (Heston, Halli)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 04/17 5:30 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor SourceOne Ventures, Inc.. (Heston, Halli)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/17 7:13 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Casey (TR), Thomas H with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/23/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Casey: Meeting ID 512 832 0978, Passcode 1364952669, Phone 1 657 222 4959. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]