California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-03423
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Air Fayre CA, Inc.
Defendant
SMX, LLC
Represented By
David R Ongaro
Ongaro PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Miller


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
16 16 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 05/19 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT AIR FAYRE CA INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO JUNE 6, 202515 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 05/16 3:50 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 6, 2025 re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc..(Zins, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Air Fayre CA Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 05/14 10:47 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Scott Bosley counsel for Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey S. Bosley as counsel of record for Air Fayre CA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Scott Bosley added to party Air Fayre CA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bosley, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 05/14 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jinny S. Hwang counsel for Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc.. Adding Jinny S. Hwang as counsel of record for Defendant Air Fayre CA Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Air Fayre CA Inc.. (Attorney Jinny S. Hwang added to party Air Fayre CA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hwang, Jinny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/24 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc., identifying Wendy Miller; Bradley/Grombacher, LLP; Air Fayre CA Inc.; Air Fayre USA Inc.; Journey Group Limited; Jaguar Holdings Limited; SMX, LLC; TrueBlue, Inc.. (Zins, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 04/24 10:45 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Air Fayre CA, Inc. answer now due 5/23/2025, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Air Fayre CA, Inc..(Attorney David P. Zins added to party Air Fayre CA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zins, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 6 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 11:18 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUESCHEDULING ORDER on June 30, 2025. by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/21 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/18 11:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/18 11:05 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/18 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 6:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SMX, LLC identifying TrueBlue, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Ongaro, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Thu 04/17 6:18 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer Prath re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant SMX, LLC. (Ongaro, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Thu 04/17 6:15 PM
DECLARATION of Cara R. Sherman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant SMX, LLC. (Ongaro, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/17 6:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SMX, LLC. (Ongaro, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/17 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV02465 Receipt No: ACACDC-39531450 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant SMX, LLC. (Attorney David R Ongaro added to party SMX, LLC(pty:dft))(Ongaro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice To Plaintiff Of Removal,
Att: 2 Verification Of State Court Records
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 04/18 11:16 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Air Fayre CA, Inc., Does 1 to 10, inclusive, SMX, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Wendy Miller. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/29/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF CARA R. SHERMAN) (ghap) Modified on 4/18/2025 (ghap)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/18 11:19 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Air Fayre CA, Inc., Does 1 to 10, inclusive, SMX, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Wendy Miller. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/2/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF CARA R. SHERMAN)(ghap) Modified on 4/18/2025 (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 04/18 11:22 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant SMX, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF CARA R. SHERMAN)(ghap)
Related: [-]