California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:25-cv-03387
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff
Sergey Firsov
333 Escula Ave, Apt. 141
Mountain View, CA 94040


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 2:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sergey Firsov. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
9 9 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 04/29 2:09 PM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to JetBlue Airways Corporation on 4/18/2025 by Sergey Firsov. Waiver of Service due by 5/18/2025. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/29/2025) Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 2 (4/29/2025) Envelope
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 04/18 1:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: ECF REGISTRATION (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/18 1:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee shall be paid by May 6, 2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/17 3:30 PM
NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants from Judge Thomas S. Hixson re1 Complaint. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/17 3:27 PM
Proposed Summons - Firsov v. JetBlue Airways Corporation. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/17 3:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sergey Firsov. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/17 3:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation. Filed by Sergey Firsov. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2025. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope