California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Referred: Pslc Chc
Case #: 4:25-cv-03367
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:California Central, 2:25-cv-01133
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Lake County Jail
Defendant
Lynn
Plaintiff
Andy Lashawn Fortner
93827 Lake County Jail 4913 Helbush Drive
Lakeport, CA 95453


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Tue 04/29 1:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andy Lashawn Fortner.(kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/17 11:29 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:25-cv-01133. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 04/17 3:20 PM
Changed plaintiff's address to include booking number 93827 (corrected from Building 93827). (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Thu 04/17 12:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/27/2025. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTIONS TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. In the furtherance of justice, the Court transfers these actions to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. See 28 U.S.C. § 2241(d), 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). It is so ordered. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Lake County Jail, Nurse Lynn amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 , filed by Plaintiff Andy Lashawn Fortner(es)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR. After judicial review, docket entry 1 , Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, shall be construed as a prisoner civil rights complaint. (ghap) Modified on 4/17/2025 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 (CIVIL PRISONER RIGHTS COMPLAINT FILED AS) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin., filed by petitioner Andy LaShawn Fortner. (ghap) Modified on 2/14/2025 (ghap).
Related: [-]