California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-03377
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
The Department of Veterans Affairs Health Administration
Plaintiff
Tiana Danielle Highthick Blunt
279 Teddy Ave.
San Francisco, CA 94134


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 04/21 8:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Copy placed in outgoing mail on 4/21/2025. Modified on 4/21/2025 (ccf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against The Department of Veterans Affairs Health Administration (Filing fee $ 405.). Filed by Tiana Danielle Highthick Blunt. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/17 2:29 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See[LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Filing Fee Thu 04/17 2:25 PM
FEE PAID (Filing fee$ 405.). (kmg, COURT STAFF) (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against The Department of Veterans Affairs Health Administration (Filing fee $ 405. Paid). Filed by Tiana Danielle Highthick Blunt. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2025. Modified on 4/16/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (kmg, COURT STAFF). (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/16/2025) Exh.1,
Att: 2 (4/16/2025) Exh.2,
Att: 3 (4/16/2025) Exh.3
Att: 4 (4/16/2025) CCS