New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:25-cv-03231
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 8:07 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jacqueline Marie James
The James Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 04/28 11:12 AM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery. FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE:1. Plaintiff established that "good cause" exists for it to serve a third party subpoena on Verizon Fios (hereinafter the "ISP"). See Arista Records, LLC v. Doe 3, 604 F.3d 110 (2dCir. 2010) (citing Sony Music Entm't v. Does 1-40, 326 F. Supp. 2d 556, 564-65 (S.D.N.Y. 2004)); Malibu Media, LLC v. John Does 1-11, 2013 WL 3732839 (S.D.N.Y. 2013) (same); John Wiley & Sons, Inc. v. Doe Nos. 1-30, 284 F.R.D. 185, 189 (S.D.N.Y. 2012) (same). 2. Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. 3. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on anyservice provider that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services toone of the Defendants.states: 4. If the ISP qualifies as a "cable operator," as defined by 47 U.S.C. § 522(5), which the te1m "cable operator" means any person or group of persons (A) who provides cable service over a cable system and directly or through one or more affiliates owns a significant interest in such cable system, or (B) who otherwise controls or is responsible for, through any arrangement, the management and operation of such a cable system. it shall comply with 47 U.S.C. § 551(c)(2)(B), which states: A cable operator may disclose such [personal identifying] information if the disclosure is... made pursuant to a court order authorizing such disclosure, if the subscriber is notified of such order by the person to whom the order is directed. by sending a copy of this Order to the Defendant. 5. Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed in response to a Rule 45 subpoena served on the ISP for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiffs rights as set forth in its Complaint. DONE AND ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/28/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 04/25 1:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco,
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer
6 6 motion Discovery Fri 04/25 1:43 PM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Fri 04/18 3:37 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/18 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/18 10:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/18 10:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 04/17 6:12 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 6:12 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 6:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30949651)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A