California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-03440
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 8:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
Defendant
Director Kika Scott
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Eldiiar Nazirzhanov
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/21 8:21 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eldiiar Nazirzhanov.. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 04/18 10:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER for Immigration Mandamus Case. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Danielle E. Lehman, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 04/18 8:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 04/18 4:41 AM
Proposed Summons. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 4:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Danielle E. Lehman, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20581812). Filed by Eldiiar Nazirzhanov.(Castro, Christina) Modified on 4/18/2025 (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet