Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:25-cv-01983
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff
SHERI ANN BUTLER BROCKINGTON
Represented By
JEREMY C. JACKSON
Bower Law Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 04/29 11:59 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANTHONY PARONICH, ESQ. (DOC. NO. 3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 04/21 11:17 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18229646.) filed by SHERI ANN BUTLER BROCKINGTON.Certificate of Service & Affidavit.(JACKSON, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 5:54 AM
Summons Issued as to WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 04/18 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18227352.), filed by SHERI ANN BUTLER BROCKINGTON.(JACKSON, JEREMY) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2025) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form Case Mgmt Trk Designation,
Att: 3 Designation Form